Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Ángel Jara Ruz

Deceased

Bishop of La Serena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1852BornSantiago
18 Dec 187523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
13 Mar 189441.6AppointedVicar General of Valparaíso, Chile
2 May 189845.8AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
19 Jun 189845.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
Sep 189846.1InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
31 Aug 190957.1AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
1 Mar 191764.6DiedBishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Ramón Ángel Jara Ruz:
Bishop Ramón Ángel Jara Ruz (born , died ) Bishop of La Serena

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013