Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Manuel Tomás Mesa Albornoz

Deceased

Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1854Born
17 Dec 188127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
12 Sep 189237.8AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile
1894²39.1ResignedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile
17 Feb 193479.2DiedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tomás Mesa Albornoz
Father Manuel Tomás Mesa Albornoz (born , died ) Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstitución, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 52.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast