Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de la Cruz Barros Madrid

Bishop Emeritus of Osorno, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1956 Born
29 Jun 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
12 Apr 199538.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valparaíso, Chile
12 Apr 199538.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
29 Jun 199538.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
21 Nov 200044.3AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
9 Oct 200448.2AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
10 Jan 201558.4AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
21 Mar 201558.6InstalledBishop of Osorno, Chile
11 Jun 201861.9ResignedBishop of Osorno, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Cruz Barros Madrid
Bishop Juan de la Cruz Barros Madrid (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Osorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osorno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,570
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2015
  • i: CB, 11 Mar 2015
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast