Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael de la Barra Tagle, S.V.D.

Prelate Emeritus of Illapel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1930 BornSantiago
12 Jun 195423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
17 Jun 198958.6AppointedPrelate of Illapel, Chile
9 Sep 198958.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Illapel, Chile
20 Feb 201079.3RetiredPrelate of Illapel, Chile

MicroData Summary for Rafael de la Barra Tagle:
Bishop Rafael de la Barra Tagle S.V.D. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Illapel

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Illapel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,775
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013