Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of La Serena

Archidioecesis Serenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 May 1939
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 30,596 (11,817 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadodelaserena.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 613, Los Carrera 450, La Serena, Chile
  • Telephone: (051)21.23.25; 22.29.84
  • Fax: 22.58.86

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of La Serena
1 July 1840ErectedArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of La Serena (erected)
Archdiocese of La Serena
29 May 1939ElevatedDiocese of La Serena Archdiocese of La Serena
30 April 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of La Serena
Diocese of San Felipe
Territorial Prelature of Illapel (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of La Serena
1950232,750245,60994.8%3848862,7065712727ap1951
1966221,025245,58490.0%2544693,203476525ap1967
1970326,693.0%27406704915825ap1971
1976295,156322,97591.4%2337604,91934613025ap1977
1980272,800340,80080.0%2231535,14744012325ap1981
1990301,703402,27175.0%3131624,866104016530ap1991
1999313,335391,91979.9%3235674,676494414931ap2000
2000284,517492,27557.8%3136674,246494814731ap2001
2001364,283492,27574.0%2935645,691525515331ap2002
2002350,000499,75370.0%3439734,794536315632ap2003
2003425,567521,52981.6%3233656,547514713832ap2004
2004428,702521,52982.2%2933626,914544614233ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013