Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Crescente Errázuriz Valdivieso

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1839Born
18 Dec 186324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
8 Feb 188444.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Feb 188545.1Solemn ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1911¹71.0IncardinatedPriest of Santiago de Chile
30 Dec 191879.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
12 Jan 191979.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
29 Jan 191979.1InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
5 Jun 193191.5DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Crescente Errázuriz Valdivieso (VIAF: 64382103)
Archbishop Crescente Errázuriz Valdivieso (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 203
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017