Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José María Cardinal Caro Rodríguez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1866BornCáhuil
20 Dec 189024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
6 May 191144.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
5 Jan 191245.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
28 Apr 191245.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
14 Dec 192559.5AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
24 Apr 192659.8InstalledBishop of La Serena, Chile
20 May 193972.9AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
28 Aug 193973.2AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
14 Oct 193973.3InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
18 Feb 194679.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 May 194679.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
4 Dec 195892.4DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for José María Caro Rodríguez:
Cardinal José María Caro Rodríguez (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 28
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013