Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Manuel Sobrino y Minayo

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1725BornUrueña, Spain
13 Mar 177550.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
6 Aug 177550.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
16 Dec 177651.9AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
15 Dec 178863.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
15 Nov 179065.8InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
12 Sep 179469.6AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
20 Sep 179570.6InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Peru
26 Apr 179671.2DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Blas Manuel Sobrino y Minayo:
Bishop Blas Manuel Sobrino y Minayo (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 92, Number 471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015