Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Lira Infante

Deceased

Bishop of Valparaíso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1879BornSantiago
21 Dec 191233.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
14 Dec 192546.7AppointedBishop of Rancagua, Chile
3 Jan 192646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rancagua, Chile
2 May 192647.1InstalledBishop of Rancagua, Chile
17 Mar 193859.0AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
11 Jun 193859.2InstalledBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
26 Sep 195879.5DiedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Rafael Lira Infante
Bishop Rafael Lira Infante (born , died ) Bishop of Valparaíso

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016