Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Edwards Salas

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chile, Military

Titular Bishop of Dodona

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1878BornSantiago
23 Mar 190123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 May 191032.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chile, Military
21 Apr 191537.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dodona
31 Oct 191537.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dodona
22 Jun 192143.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
5 Aug 193860.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Chile, Military

MicroData Summary for Rafael Edwards Salas:
Bishop Rafael Edwards Salas (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chile, Military

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013