Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando (José Ismael) Errázuriz Gandarillas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Drusiliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1916BornSantiago
20 Sep 194125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
31 Jan 196952.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
31 Jan 196952.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
4 May 196952.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
31 Aug 197357.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Fernando (José Ismael) Errázuriz Gandarillas:
Bishop Fernando (José Ismael) Errázuriz Gandarillas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015