Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Fernando Ramos Pérez

Archbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1959 Born
12 Aug 198930.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
5 May 199031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
1 Feb 201455.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
1 Feb 201455.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tetci
10 May 201455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tetci
28 Jun 201859.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rancagua, Chile
27 Dec 201960.9AppointedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
29 Feb 202061.1InstalledArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile

MicroData Summary for Luis Fernando Ramos Pérez
Archbishop Luis Fernando Ramos Pérez (born ) Archbishop of Puerto Montt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Puerto Montt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 10 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,153
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2019
  • c01: CB, 6 Feb 2020
  • i: CB, 11 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast