Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Silva Cotapos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Talca

Titular Bishop of Myrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1868BornTalca
21 Sep 189123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
20 Feb 191849.7AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
7 Jun 191850.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Serena, Chile
14 Dec 192557.5AppointedBishop of Talca, Chile
23 May 192658.0InstalledBishop of Talca, Chile
21 Jan 193970.6ResignedBishop of Talca, Chile
21 Jan 193970.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrica
29 Sep 194173.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Talca, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Silva Cotapos:
Bishop Carlos Silva Cotapos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Talca

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015