Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Enrique Concha Cayuqueo, O.F.M.

Bishop of Osorno, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1958 Born
23 Dec 198325.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 May 198627.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
20 Dec 198628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 201557.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
14 Jul 201557.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
29 Aug 201557.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpi
11 Jun 201860.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osorno, Chile
5 Feb 202061.6AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
8 Mar 202061.7InstalledBishop of Osorno, Chile

MicroData Summary for Jorge Enrique Concha Cayuqueo
Bishop Jorge Enrique Concha Cayuqueo O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Osorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarahue, Diocese of Temuco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osorno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2015
  • c01/od: CB, 14 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 29 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,565
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2020
  • i: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast