Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Mario Ossandón Buljevic

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of La Imperial

Apostolic Administrator of Valparaíso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1957 Born
20 Dec 198629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Nov 200851.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
4 Nov 200851.0AppointedTitular Bishop of La Imperial
12 Dec 200851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of La Imperial
16 Jan 201153.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
20 Apr 201153.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
10 Jul 201254.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Jun 201860.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Pedro Mario Ossandón Buljevic
Bishop Pedro Mario Ossandón Buljevic (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Concepción, Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,996
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast