Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Martinez Silva

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

Titular Bishop of Iasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1889Born
30 Oct 191223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
10 Aug 194051.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
10 Aug 194051.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
11 Dec 194051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
1951¹61.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
7 Feb 196979.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Martinez Silva
Bishop Salvador Martinez Silva (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018