Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis María Martínez y Rodríguez

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1881Born
20 Nov 190423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Michoacán, México
8 Jun 192341.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Michoacán, México
8 Jun 192341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
30 Sep 192342.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
10 Nov 193453.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
20 Feb 193755.6AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
14 Apr 193755.8InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
9 Feb 195674.6DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Luis María Martínez y Rodríguez
Archbishop Luis María Martínez y Rodríguez (born , died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolinos de Caballero

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 56
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 509, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast