Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Ruiz y Flóres

Deceased

Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1865BornAmealco
17 Mar 188822.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 190034.9AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
27 Dec 190035.1Ordained BishopBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
14 Sep 190741.8AppointedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
6 Nov 190741.9InstalledArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
27 Nov 191146.0AppointedArchbishop of Michoacán, México
12 Jan 191246.1InstalledArchbishop of Michoacán, México
12 Dec 194176.0DiedArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Ruiz y Flóres:
Archbishop Leopoldo Ruiz y Flóres (born , died ) Archbishop of Morelia

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015