Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Sarmiento y Luna (Enríquez), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615²BornSevilla, Spain
12 Nov 166853.9AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
5 Jan 167055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
25 Sep 167358.7AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
27 May 167560.4AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
21 Jul 168368.6DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Sarmiento y Luna (Enríquez):
Bishop Francisco Antonio Sarmiento y Luna (Enríquez) O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 205, Number 1,282
  • bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014