Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejo Zavala Castro

Bishop Emeritus of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1941 Born
17 Dec 196624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
4 Jan 199250.0AppointedBishop of Tlapa, Guerrero, México
25 Mar 199250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tlapa, Guerrero, México
19 Nov 200563.8AppointedBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México
14 Feb 200664.1InstalledBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México
20 Jun 201573.4ResignedBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Alejo Zavala Castro
Bishop Alejo Zavala Castro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chilpancingo-Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaleana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,664
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast