Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Guerra, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1579AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
12 Aug 1582Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
9 Mar 1592AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
18 Jun 1596DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Guerra
Bishop Alfonso Guerra O.P. (died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladoilid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopRosaire, Church, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018