Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Iglesia Cajiga, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antonio de San Miguel)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1724³Born
17 Feb 177752.4AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
15 Dec 178359.3AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
25 Jun 178459.8InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
18 Jun 180479.8DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Iglesia Cajiga
Bishop Francisco Antonio Iglesia Cajiga O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRevilla, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 94, Number 484
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175, and Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast