Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Medina Rincón y de la Vega, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1520Born
18 Jun 157453.4AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
5 Dec 157453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
30 Jun 158867.5DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Juan de Medina Rincón y de la Vega
Bishop Juan de Medina Rincón y de la Vega O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina del Campo
Ordained BishopSan Agustín, Church, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,358
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 86, Number 522
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast