Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortino Gómez León

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1890BornCelaya
30 Oct 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 194252.3AppointedArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Feb 194352.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
25 Jul 196777.0RetiredArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
25 Jul 196777.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ceramus
31 Dec 197080.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Ceramus
13 Jun 198695.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Fortino Gómez León:
Archbishop Fortino Gómez León (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013