Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo de Ulloa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1585AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
1586²Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
9 Dec 1591AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
3 Apr 1598AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
1601²DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo de Ulloa
Bishop Domingo de Ulloa O.P. (died 1601) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToro, Spain
Death PlaceMexico

  • a bishop for 15.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257, and Page 278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 98, Number 615
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018