Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Jesús Tirado Pedraza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1908BornSanta Ana Maya
10 May 193123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
21 May 196355.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
21 May 196355.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
25 Jul 196355.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
1 Apr 196557.0AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México
25 Jan 197364.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
25 Jan 197364.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mevania
7 Dec 197668.7AppointedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
25 Jan 197768.8InstalledArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
8 Nov 198375.6RetiredArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
8 Jul 199385.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Tirado Pedraza:
Archbishop José de Jesús Tirado Pedraza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monterrey

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013