Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Navarro Ramirez

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1912Born
27 Oct 193523.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 196553.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
17 Aug 196553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
18 Aug 197058.4DiedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Navarro Ramirez
Bishop Juan Navarro Ramirez (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Altamirano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelaya

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast