Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavio Villegas Aguilar

Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Cissita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1940 BornCopándaro
5 Mar 196626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
27 Apr 199454.3AppointedBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
25 May 199454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
29 Dec 200565.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
29 Dec 200565.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissita

MicroData Summary for Octavio Villegas Aguilar:
Bishop Octavio Villegas Aguilar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Oct 2014