Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Jesús Ortíz y Rodríguez

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1849Born
187727.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 189343.5AppointedBishop of Chihuahua, México
10 Sep 189343.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chihuahua, México
3 Oct 189343.8InstalledBishop of Chihuahua, México
16 Sep 190151.8AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 Jan 190252.1InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Jun 191262.5DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Ortíz y Rodríguez (VIAF: 251083190)
Archbishop José de Jesús Ortíz y Rodríguez (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlacePátzcuaro, Archdiocese of Michoacán
Ordained BishopMorelia, Archdiocese of Michoacán

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201, and Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017