Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidel Cortés Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1912Born
9 Jul 193927.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 195846.6AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
24 Feb 195946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
14 Aug 198270.3DiedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Fidel Cortés Pérez
Bishop Fidel Cortés Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTumbisca

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast