Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos de Moriana y Zafrilla

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1745Born
26 Jun 180559.8AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
1806²60.3Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
27 Jul 180963.9DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcos de Moriana y Zafrilla
Bishop Marcos de Moriana y Zafrilla (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCañada del Hoyo, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 259
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,482
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 126, Number 674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast