Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Félix Valverde

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1689³BornGranada, Spain
15 Nov 172839.7AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
19 Mar 173041.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
27 Aug 173849.4SelectedBishop of Michoacán, México
24 Nov 173849.7ConfirmedBishop of Michoacán, México
23 Feb 174151.9DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Félix Valverde:
Bishop José Félix Valverde (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 194
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015