Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltazar de Covarrubias y Múñoz, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹BornMexico City
10 Sep 160141.6SelectedBishop of Paraguay
13 Jan 160343.0AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
6 Jun 160545.4AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
4 Feb 160848.0AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
22 Jul 162262.5DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Baltazar de Covarrubias y Múñoz:
Bishop Baltazar de Covarrubias y Múñoz O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Michoacán

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015