Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Garfias Merlos

Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1951 Born
23 Nov 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
24 Jun 199645.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
25 Jul 199645.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
8 Jul 200352.5AppointedBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
2 Aug 200352.5InstalledBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
7 Jun 201059.4AppointedArchbishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
24 Jul 201059.5InstalledArchbishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
5 Nov 201665.8AppointedArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Carlos Garfias Merlos
Archbishop Carlos Garfias Merlos (born ) Archbishop of Morelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuxpan, Archdiocese of Morelia, Michoacán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,776
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast