Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victorino Alvarez Tena

Deceased

Bishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1920Born
10 Apr 194323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
24 May 196242.2AppointedBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
25 Jul 196242.3Ordained BishopBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
14 Feb 197453.9AppointedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
4 Nov 198767.6DiedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Victorino Alvarez Tena
Bishop Victorino Alvarez Tena (born , died ) Bishop of Celaya

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuruándiro

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast