Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José López Lara

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1927BornMoroleón
19 Sep 195326.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 196740.7AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
22 Feb 196840.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
4 Sep 198154.5InstalledBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
27 Apr 198760.1DiedBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José López Lara:
Bishop José López Lara (born , died ) Bishop of San Juan de los Lagos

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Nov 2014