Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Ortega Cano Montañez y Patiño

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1627BornLlanes, Spain
22 Jun 167244.9SelectedBishop of Durango, México
16 Apr 167446.7ConfirmedBishop of Durango, México
24 Mar 167547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
9 Sep 167548.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
11 Feb 167648.6InstalledBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
8 Jun 168254.9AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
21 Jul 168457.0InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
21 Jun 170072.9AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
16 Dec 170881.4DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Juan de Ortega Cano Montañez y Patiño:
Archbishop Juan de Ortega Cano Montañez y Patiño (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 262, and Page 267
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 212, Number 1,322
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015