Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop García Felipe de Legazpi y Velasco Altamirano y Albornoz

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1643BornMéxico
27 Aug 169148.5AppointedBishop of Durango, México
7 Dec 169249.8Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
8 Aug 170158.4AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
4 Mar 170360.0InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
14 Jan 170460.9AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
30 May 170461.2InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
6 Mar 170663.0DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for García Felipe de Legazpi y Velasco Altamirano y Albornoz:
Bishop García Felipe de Legazpi y Velasco Altamirano y Albornoz (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015