Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Fernando de Hoyos y Mier

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1708Born
17 Jun 177364.8SelectedBishop of Michoacán, México
12 Jul 177364.8ConfirmedBishop of Michoacán, México
27 Dec 177365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
13 Dec 177567.3DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Fernando de Hoyos y Mier
Bishop Luis Fernando de Hoyos y Mier (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBores, Spain

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,890
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 465
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast