Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Fernández Hurtado

Archbishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1952 Born
14 Oct 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tula, Hidalgo, México
11 Feb 200552.1AppointedBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
11 May 200552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
26 Sep 201461.8AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
21 Nov 201461.9InstalledArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Fernández Hurtado
Archbishop José Antonio Fernández Hurtado (born ) Archbishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorelia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Durango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,884
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2014
  • i: CB, 3 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast