Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de Ubilla, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México

Note/Previous Titular See: (never took possession of Michoacan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
22 Jul 155818.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 May 159252.3AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
29 Jan 160363.0AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
May 1603³63.3DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Ubilla
Bishop Andrés de Ubilla O.P. (born 1540, died May 1603) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEibar, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopDominican, Convent, Atlacubaya
Death PlaceChipas, Diocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 666
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018