Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Espinoza Jiménez

Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México

Titular Bishop of Arpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1965 Born
31 Jan 199327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
15 Dec 201045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
15 Dec 201045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arpi
22 Feb 201145.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arpi

MicroData Summary for Juan Espinoza Jiménez
Bishop Juan Espinoza Jiménez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Morelia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiedad

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast