Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fernández de Rosillo (Rovillo)

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533¹Born
12 Jun 159259.4AppointedBishop of Verapaz, Guatemala
16 Jun 160370.4AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
29 Oct 160673.8DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fernández de Rosillo (Rovillo)
Bishop Juan Fernández de Rosillo (Rovillo) (born 1533, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopCartagena, Diocese of Cartagena, Colombia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 663
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast