Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Atenógenes Silva y Álvarez Tostado

Deceased

Archbishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1848BornGuadalajara
30 Nov 187123.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189243.9AppointedBishop of Colima, México
9 Oct 189244.1Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
21 Dec 189244.3InstalledBishop of Colima, México
31 Aug 190052.0AppointedArchbishop of Michoacán, México
27 Nov 190052.3InstalledArchbishop of Michoacán, México
21 Feb 191162.5DiedArchbishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Atenógenes Silva y Álvarez Tostado:
Archbishop Atenógenes Silva y Álvarez Tostado (born , died ) Archbishop of Michoacán

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 214, and Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013