Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Escalante Colombres y Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649¹BornLerma
3 Oct 170152.7AppointedBishop of Durango, México
21 Jan 170354.0Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
19 May 170455.3AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
27 Jun 170455.4InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
15 May 170859.3DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Escalante Colombres y Mendoza:
Bishop Manuel de Escalante Colombres y Mendoza (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 262
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015