Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pablo Matos y Coronado

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1697³Born
29 Apr 173436.7SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
9 Jul 173436.9ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
16 Mar 173638.6InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
4 Oct 174043.2SelectedBishop of Michoacán, México
2 Jan 174143.4ConfirmedBishop of Michoacán, México
20 Aug 174144.1InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
26 Apr 174446.7DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pablo Matos y Coronado
Bishop Francisco Pablo Matos y Coronado (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGran Canaria, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 226
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast