Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clemente de Jesús Munguía y Núñez

Deceased

Archbishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1810³Born
9 May 184130.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 May 184130.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 185039.8AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
18 Jan 185241.1Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
19 Mar 186352.3AppointedArchbishop of Michoacán, México
14 Dec 186858.0DiedArchbishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente de Jesús Munguía y Núñez (VIAF: 36028831)
Archbishop Clemente de Jesús Munguía y Núñez (born , died ) Archbishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Reyes

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 375
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017