Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Anselmo Sánchez de Tagle

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697¹BornSantillana, Spain
27 Jan 174750.0SelectedBishop of Durango, México
10 Apr 174750.2ConfirmedBishop of Durango, México
26 Sep 175760.7AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
18 Jun 175861.4InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
27 May 177275.4DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Anselmo Sánchez de Tagle:
Bishop Pedro Anselmo Sánchez de Tagle (born 1697, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 306
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202, and Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015