Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco de Quiroga

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480²Born
18 Aug 153656.6AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
5 Jan 153959.0Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
14 Mar 156585.2DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasco de Quiroga (VIAF: 89626164)
Bishop Vasco de Quiroga (born 1480, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrigal de las Altas Torres, Diocese of Ávila, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Diocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceUruapan

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 50, Number 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018