Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Rivera y Pareja, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561Born
158221.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
29 Jan 161857.0AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Oct 161857.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
17 Sep 162968.7AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
7 Aug 163069.5InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
8 Oct 163776.7DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Rivera y Pareja
Bishop Francisco de Rivera y Pareja O. de M. (born 1561, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá de Henares, Spain

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 137, Number 875
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018